THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:51:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Emory University School of Medicine, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 807 Broadview Ave
The Albany Clinic
Toronto ON M4K 2P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-461-9471
Fax: 416-461-2710

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 May 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Antil Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Antil (CPSO#: 147394 )
Business Address: 807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 2P8
4164619471

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Emory University School of Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 807 Broadview Ave
The Albany Clinic
Toronto ON M4K 2P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-461-9471
Fax: 416-461-2710

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 May 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Antil Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Antil (CPSO#: 147394 )
Business Address: 807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 2P8
4164619471

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
07 Sep 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 07 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MICHAEL ALAN ANTIL may practise medicine independently in primary care, excluding pediatrics and obstetrics.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MICHAEL ALAN ANTIL may practise medicine independently in primary care, excluding pediatrics and obstetrics.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Emory University School of Medicine, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Sep 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 31 May 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Sep 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 May 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 May 2023