THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:43:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 713 Montréal Road
Hôpital Montfort
Soins intensifs
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-746-4621
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Health Sciences North
Intensive Care Unit
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: 705-523-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Queensway Carleton
Intensive care unit
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Phone: 613-721-2000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 713 Montréal Road
Hôpital Montfort
Soins intensifs
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-746-4621
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Health Sciences North
Intensive Care Unit
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: 705-523-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Queensway Carleton
Intensive care unit
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Phone: 613-721-2000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILIPPE SIMARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMARD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILIPPE SIMARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMARD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2023
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 2023