THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 06:00:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universitatea de Medicină și Farmacie Grigore T. Popa Facultatea de Medicină, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1111 Ghislain Street Hawkesbury, ON K6A 3G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-632-1111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5400 Boul Gouin O
Hôpital du Sacré-Cœur-de-Montréal
Montréal QC H4J 1C5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 27 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ELENA CIUBOTARIU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ciubotariu (CPSO#: 148117 )
Business Address: 613-632-1111

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ROMANIAN
Medical School: Universitatea de Medicină și Farmacie Grigore T. Popa Facultatea de Medicină, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1111 Ghislain Street Hawkesbury, ON K6A 3G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-632-1111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5400 Boul Gouin O
Hôpital du Sacré-Cœur-de-Montréal
Montréal QC H4J 1C5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 27 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ELENA CIUBOTARIU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ciubotariu (CPSO#: 148117 )
Business Address: 613-632-1111

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELENA CIUBOTARIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CIUBOTARIU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELENA CIUBOTARIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CIUBOTARIU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universitatea de Medicină și Farmacie Grigore T. Popa Facultatea de Medicină, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2024