THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 06:15:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1755 Brimley Road
One Care Clinic
Toronto Ontario M1P 0A3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162900361
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 25 Apr 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 25 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: NOURHAN GAMAL SHAFIK BAYOUMY SHAFEEY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Shafeey (CPSO#: 148147 )
Business Address: 4 Kincaid Lane
Markham Ontario L3S 0B9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1755 Brimley Road
One Care Clinic
Toronto Ontario M1P 0A3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162900361
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 25 Apr 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 25 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: NOURHAN GAMAL SHAFIK BAYOUMY SHAFEEY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Shafeey (CPSO#: 148147 )
Business Address: 4 Kincaid Lane
Markham Ontario L3S 0B9

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
03 May 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 03 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. NOURHAN GAMAL SHAFIK BAYOUMY SHAFEEY may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. NOURHAN GAMAL SHAFIK BAYOUMY SHAFEEY may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 May 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 May 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 May 2024