THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:52:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Shahid Beheshti University of Medical Sciences Faculty of Medicine, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4040 Finch Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1S 4V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-292-1505
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 30 The Queensway
St Joseph Health Centre
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 May 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. MOUSAVI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Jafari Mousavi (CPSO#: 148486 )
Business Address: 4040 Finch Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1S 4V5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Shahid Beheshti University of Medical Sciences Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4040 Finch Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1S 4V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-292-1505
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 30 The Queensway
St Joseph Health Centre
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 May 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. MOUSAVI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Jafari Mousavi (CPSO#: 148486 )
Business Address: 4040 Finch Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1S 4V5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FOROOGH JAFARI MOUSAVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAFARI MOUSAVI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FOROOGH JAFARI MOUSAVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAFARI MOUSAVI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Shahid Beheshti University of Medical Sciences Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2023
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2023