THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:26:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: Shahabinezhad, Ali (Used Until: 10 Jun 2024)
Medical School: Shiraz University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 210 Melrose Ave S
Civic Family Medicine Centre
Ottawa ON K1Y 4K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: Shahabinezhad, Ali (Used Until: 10 Jun 2024)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN
Medical School: Shiraz University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 210 Melrose Ave S
Civic Family Medicine Centre
Ottawa ON K1Y 4K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALI SHAHABI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SHAHABI is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. SHAHABI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SHAHABI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SHAHABI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SHAHABI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SHAHABI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALI SHAHABI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SHAHABI is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. SHAHABI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SHAHABI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SHAHABI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SHAHABI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SHAHABI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Shiraz University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 2018
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
Toronto Metropolitan University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Ottawa
AVP - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: Toronto Metropolitan University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: AVP - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023