THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:43:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2023
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Devon Rose Aitken Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Aitken (CPSO#: 149117 )
Business Address: 700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 0A2
705-267-2131

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2023

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Devon Rose Aitken Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Aitken (CPSO#: 149117 )
Business Address: 700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 0A2
705-267-2131

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEVON ROSE AITKEN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. AITKEN is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. AITKEN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AITKEN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. AITKEN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. AITKEN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. AITKEN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEVON ROSE AITKEN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. AITKEN is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. AITKEN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AITKEN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. AITKEN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. AITKEN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. AITKEN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2023
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023