THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:22:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: Lawan, Hannatu Ayuba (Used Until: 28 Jul 2024)
Medical School: 3. Lékařská Fakulta, Univerzity Karlovy, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3750 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1G 1R1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +4374381664
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. HANNATU OYEDOTUN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Oyedotun (CPSO#: 149418 )
Business Address: 3750 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1G 1R1

General Information

Former Name: Lawan, Hannatu Ayuba (Used Until: 28 Jul 2024)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: 3. Lékařská Fakulta, Univerzity Karlovy, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3750 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1G 1R1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +4374381664
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. HANNATU OYEDOTUN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Oyedotun (CPSO#: 149418 )
Business Address: 3750 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1G 1R1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANNATU AYUBA OYEDOTUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OYEDOTUN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANNATU AYUBA OYEDOTUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OYEDOTUN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: 3. Lékařská Fakulta, Univerzity Karlovy, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2023
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Oct 2023