THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:17:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: Iheme, Chinwe Grace (Used Until: 30 Mar 2023)
Medical School: University of Lagos College of Medicine, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 34 Richard William Drive
Caledonia Ontario N3W 0G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289 651 4444
Fax: 289 451 2680

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Oct 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR CHINWE OKECHUKWU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL COPORATION INC.
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Okechukwu (CPSO#: 149424 )
Business Address: 77 Hunter St E
Hamilton ON L8N 1M4
9056670290

General Information

Former Name: Iheme, Chinwe Grace (Used Until: 30 Mar 2023)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Lagos College of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 34 Richard William Drive
Caledonia Ontario N3W 0G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289 651 4444
Fax: 289 451 2680

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Oct 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR CHINWE OKECHUKWU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL COPORATION INC.
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Okechukwu (CPSO#: 149424 )
Business Address: 77 Hunter St E
Hamilton ON L8N 1M4
9056670290

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHINWE GRACE OKECHUKWU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OKECHUKWU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHINWE GRACE OKECHUKWU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OKECHUKWU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Lagos College of Medicine, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2023
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Oct 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Oct 2023