THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:16:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: Radonjic, Aleksandar (Used Until: 02 Apr 2023)
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 372-6811
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ALEKS RADONICH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Radonich (CPSO#: 149464 )
Business Address: 1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6

General Information

Former Name: Radonjic, Aleksandar (Used Until: 02 Apr 2023)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 372-6811
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ALEKS RADONICH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Radonich (CPSO#: 149464 )
Business Address: 1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEKS RADONICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RADONICH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEKS RADONICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RADONICH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Apr 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023