THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:07:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Obafemi Awolowo University College of Health Sciences, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 262-2 King St W
Jackson Square Medical Center
Hamilton ON L8P 1A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1 888-350-2323
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Oct 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: OGUNLEYE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORRPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Ogunleye (CPSO#: 149593 )
Business Address: 262-2 King Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8P 4X2
2893092626

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Obafemi Awolowo University College of Health Sciences, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 262-2 King St W
Jackson Square Medical Center
Hamilton ON L8P 1A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1 888-350-2323
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Oct 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: OGUNLEYE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORRPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Ogunleye (CPSO#: 149593 )
Business Address: 262-2 King Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8P 4X2
2893092626

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
30 Oct 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 30 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. TOKUNBO ABDULGANIYU OGUNLEYE may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. TOKUNBO ABDULGANIYU OGUNLEYE may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Obafemi Awolowo University College of Health Sciences, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2023
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Oct 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Oct 2023