THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:19:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Debrecen Faculty of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 537 Frederick Street
Magnolia Health Center
Kitchener Ontario N2B 2A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 804-4190
Fax: 519-340-6819

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Aug 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 18 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. KUTEYI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Kuteyi (CPSO#: 149671 )
Business Address: 519-804-4190
Business Address: 519-804-4190

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Debrecen Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 537 Frederick Street
Magnolia Health Center
Kitchener Ontario N2B 2A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 804-4190
Fax: 519-340-6819

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Aug 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 18 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. KUTEYI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Kuteyi (CPSO#: 149671 )
Business Address: 519-804-4190
Business Address: 519-804-4190

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLUFUNSO BABAFUNMILAYO KUTEYI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUTEYI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLUFUNSO BABAFUNMILAYO KUTEYI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUTEYI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Debrecen Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2023