THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:15:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Ave
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anesthesia and Pain Medicine
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 05 Jul 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 05 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moustaqim-Barrette Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 May 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Moustaqim-Barrette (CPSO#: 149695 ) Dr. R. Simmons-Beck (CPSO#: 139712 )
Business Address: 555 University Avenue
Attention/Care of the Department of Anesthesia and Pain Medicine
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
6475727053

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Ave
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anesthesia and Pain Medicine
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 05 Jul 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 05 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moustaqim-Barrette Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 May 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Moustaqim-Barrette (CPSO#: 149695 ) Dr. R. Simmons-Beck (CPSO#: 139712 )
Business Address: 555 University Avenue
Attention/Care of the Department of Anesthesia and Pain Medicine
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
6475727053

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 Jul 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 12 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MARIA MOUSTAQIM-BARRETTE may practise medicine independently in anesthesiology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MARIA MOUSTAQIM-BARRETTE may practise medicine independently in anesthesiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023