THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:40:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Government Medical College Amritsar, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas St E
Belleville ON K8N 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6139697400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Apr 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 15 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: TANJIT SINGH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Singh (CPSO#: 149779 )
Business Address: 265 Dundas Street East
265 Dundas St E
Belleville Ontario K8N
6139697400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Government Medical College Amritsar, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas St E
Belleville ON K8N 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6139697400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Apr 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 15 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: TANJIT SINGH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Singh (CPSO#: 149779 )
Business Address: 265 Dundas Street East
265 Dundas St E
Belleville Ontario K8N
6139697400

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
22 Apr 2024
21 Apr 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 22 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Apr 21 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. TANJIT SINGH may practise internal medicine with Belleville General Hospital in Belleville, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. SINGH’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. SINGH’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. SINGH’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 22 April, 2024, and will expire on or before 21 April, 2027, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. TANJIT SINGH may practise internal medicine with Belleville General Hospital in Belleville, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. SINGH’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. SINGH’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. SINGH’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 22 April, 2024, and will expire on or before 21 April, 2027, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Government Medical College Amritsar, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Apr 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Apr 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 21 Apr 2027