THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:25:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Jaffna Faculty of Medicine, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALA, SINHALESE, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3-755 Queensway E
Prime Medical Centre
Mississauga ON L4Y 4C5
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: +19058975454
Fax: +19058977494
Address: 1-68 Abell St
Prime Medical Centre
Toronto ON M6J 0B1
Phone: +14165328181
Fax: +14165320268

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Sep 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Sri Lanka
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALA, SINHALESE, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Jaffna Faculty of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3-755 Queensway E
Prime Medical Centre
Mississauga ON L4Y 4C5
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: +19058975454
Fax: +19058977494
Address: 1-68 Abell St
Prime Medical Centre
Toronto ON M6J 0B1
Phone: +14165328181
Fax: +14165320268

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Sep 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Sri Lanka
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRUNTHIGA PARAMANANTHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARAMANANTHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRUNTHIGA PARAMANANTHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARAMANANTHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Jaffna Faculty of Medicine, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2023
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2023