THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:35:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Islamia University of Bahawalpur, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1750 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M9C 5H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162388492
Fax: 8886051164

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jan 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 25 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR N A SALEEM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Saleem (CPSO#: 150027 )
Business Address: 1750 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M9C 5H5
4375517884

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Islamia University of Bahawalpur, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1750 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M9C 5H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162388492
Fax: 8886051164

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jan 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 25 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR N A SALEEM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Saleem (CPSO#: 150027 )
Business Address: 1750 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M9C 5H5
4375517884

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
29 Jan 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 29 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. NAZAR ABBAS SALEEM may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. NAZAR ABBAS SALEEM may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Islamia University of Bahawalpur, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jan 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jan 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Jan 2024