THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:53:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ayub Medical College, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PUSHTO, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 535 Mulock Drive
Suite 102
All Med Health Family Medicine and Urgent Care Clinic
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-727-4241
Fax: 2893400403

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Feb 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 08 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. M RIAZ MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Riaz (CPSO#: 150050 )
Business Address: 102 - 535 Mulock Drive
All Med Health Family Medicine
and Urgent Care Clinic
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5H2
(905) 727-4241

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PUSHTO, URDU
Medical School: Ayub Medical College, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 535 Mulock Drive
Suite 102
All Med Health Family Medicine and Urgent Care Clinic
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-727-4241
Fax: 2893400403

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Feb 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 08 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. M RIAZ MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Riaz (CPSO#: 150050 )
Business Address: 102 - 535 Mulock Drive
All Med Health Family Medicine
and Urgent Care Clinic
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5H2
(905) 727-4241

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
13 Feb 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 13 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MUHAMMAD RIAZ may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MUHAMMAD RIAZ may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ayub Medical College, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2024