THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:51:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: October 6 University Faculty of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 Chesley Ave
Victoria family medicine centre
London ON N5Z 2C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5194338424
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Whiston Hospital
St. Helen's and Knowsley Lead employer
Lead employer for GP trainees
Employer
Prescot Merseyside United Kingdom L35 5DR
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: October 6 University Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 Chesley Ave
Victoria family medicine centre
London ON N5Z 2C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5194338424
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Whiston Hospital
St. Helen's and Knowsley Lead employer
Lead employer for GP trainees
Employer
Prescot Merseyside United Kingdom L35 5DR
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MINA SAMEH R AWAD shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. AWAD is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. AWAD shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AWAD is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. AWAD shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. AWAD is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. AWAD no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 20 October, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MINA SAMEH R AWAD shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. AWAD is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. AWAD shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AWAD is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. AWAD shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. AWAD is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. AWAD no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 20 October, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: October 6 University Faculty of Medicine, 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2025 to 20 Oct 2025
Western University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
22 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 21 Oct 2024
Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
17 Jan 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
Western University
AVP - Family Medicine
24 Oct 2023 to 16 Jan 2024
Western University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 20 Oct 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 22 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 21 Oct 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 17 Jan 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: AVP - Family Medicine
DATE: 24 Oct 2023 to 16 Jan 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 20 Oct 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 20 Oct 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2023