THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:57:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ghana Medical School, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3750 Lawrence Avenue East
3750 Lawrence Ave E, Scarborough, ON
Toronto Ontario M1G 1R1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 438-1664
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Nov 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: TETTEH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Tetteh (CPSO#: 150476 )
Business Address: unit 606-30 Oak Street
Toronto Ontario M5A 0A2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ghana Medical School, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3750 Lawrence Avenue East
3750 Lawrence Ave E, Scarborough, ON
Toronto Ontario M1G 1R1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 438-1664
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Nov 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: TETTEH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Tetteh (CPSO#: 150476 )
Business Address: unit 606-30 Oak Street
Toronto Ontario M5A 0A2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ENOCH TETTEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TETTEH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ENOCH TETTEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TETTEH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 14 Feb 2025
Summary:
Bail Conditions

On February 14, 2025, the following Release Conditions were imposed on Enoch Tetteh:

1.  Tetteh must notify Police of his address within 24 hours of his release.
2.  Tetteh must notify Police of his address within 24 hours of any change in address.
3.  Tetteh must not contact or communicate in any way either directly or indirectly, by any physical, electronic or other means, with named person.
4.  Tetteh must not be within 200 meters of any place where he knows named person lives, works, goes to school, frequents or any place he knows named person to be except for required court appearances.
5.  Tetteh must not be within 200 metres of specified location.
6.  Tetteh must not possess any weapon(s) as defined by the Criminal Code.
7.  Tetteh must not apply for an authorization, licence or registration certificate of any weapon as defined by the Criminal Code.
8.  Tetteh must, within 48 hours of release, surrender his passport to Police.

9.  Tetteh is prohibited from using or accessing any dating applications or websites, including but not limited to apps or websites designed for social or romantic connections, creating or maintaining accounts, browsing profiles, or engaging in any form of communication on such platforms.


Source: Other
Effective Date: 11 Feb 2025
Summary:

Charges

Enoch Tetteh was charged with the following offences:

1.  2 counts of  Sexual Assault, on or about January 27, 2025 and on or about February 2, 2025, contrary to section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
2.  Aggravated Sexual Assault, on or about February 3, 2025, contrary to section 273(1) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of Charge: February 11, 2025       
Place of Charge:  Toronto, Ontario
Toronto Police Services

 


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 14 Feb 2025
Summary:
Bail Conditions

On February 14, 2025, the following Release Conditions were imposed on Enoch Tetteh:

1.  Tetteh must notify Police of his address within 24 hours of his release.
2.  Tetteh must notify Police of his address within 24 hours of any change in address.
3.  Tetteh must not contact or communicate in any way either directly or indirectly, by any physical, electronic or other means, with named person.
4.  Tetteh must not be within 200 meters of any place where he knows named person lives, works, goes to school, frequents or any place he knows named person to be except for required court appearances.
5.  Tetteh must not be within 200 metres of specified location.
6.  Tetteh must not possess any weapon(s) as defined by the Criminal Code.
7.  Tetteh must not apply for an authorization, licence or registration certificate of any weapon as defined by the Criminal Code.
8.  Tetteh must, within 48 hours of release, surrender his passport to Police.

9.  Tetteh is prohibited from using or accessing any dating applications or websites, including but not limited to apps or websites designed for social or romantic connections, creating or maintaining accounts, browsing profiles, or engaging in any form of communication on such platforms.


Source: Other
Effective Date: 11 Feb 2025
Summary:

Charges

Enoch Tetteh was charged with the following offences:

1.  2 counts of  Sexual Assault, on or about January 27, 2025 and on or about February 2, 2025, contrary to section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
2.  Aggravated Sexual Assault, on or about February 3, 2025, contrary to section 273(1) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of Charge: February 11, 2025       
Place of Charge:  Toronto, Ontario
Toronto Police Services

 


Training

Medical School: University of Ghana Medical School, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2023
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2023