THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:32:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: Badru, Abimbola Olatayo (Used Until: 22 May 2023)
Medical School: University of Lagos College of Medicine, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 705 Grandview Street North
Oshawa Ontario L1K 0V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +19057251000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Nov 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abimbola Abiodun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Abiodun (CPSO#: 150744 )
Business Address: 705 Grandview Street North
Oshawa Ontario L1K 0V4
9057251000

General Information

Former Name: Badru, Abimbola Olatayo (Used Until: 22 May 2023)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA
Medical School: University of Lagos College of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 705 Grandview Street North
Oshawa Ontario L1K 0V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +19057251000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Nov 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abimbola Abiodun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Abiodun (CPSO#: 150744 )
Business Address: 705 Grandview Street North
Oshawa Ontario L1K 0V4
9057251000

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
07 Nov 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 07 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ABIMBOLA OLATAYO ABIODUN may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ABIMBOLA OLATAYO ABIODUN may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Lagos College of Medicine, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2023
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Nov 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Nov 2023