THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 23:05:24 PM

General Information

Former Name: Marsden, Laura Helen (Used Until: 01 Jan 2024)
Medical School: Hull York Medical School, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1070 Major Mackenzie Drive East
All About Health
Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 1P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 884-0666
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Mar 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 27 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Cunningham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Cunningham (CPSO#: 151090 )
Business Address: 64 Larratt Lane
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 0E1
4376026316
Business Address: 4376026316
Business Address: 1070 Major Mackenzie Drive East
All About Health
Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 1P3
905 884 0666

General Information

Former Name: Marsden, Laura Helen (Used Until: 01 Jan 2024)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Hull York Medical School, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1070 Major Mackenzie Drive East
All About Health
Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 1P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 884-0666
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Mar 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 27 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Cunningham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Cunningham (CPSO#: 151090 )
Business Address: 64 Larratt Lane
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 0E1
4376026316
Business Address: 4376026316
Business Address: 1070 Major Mackenzie Drive East
All About Health
Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 1P3
905 884 0666

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
29 Mar 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 29 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. LAURA HELEN CUNNINGHAM may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. LAURA HELEN CUNNINGHAM may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Hull York Medical School, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Mar 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Mar 2024