THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:36:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Isra University, Hyderabad Faculty of Medicine and Allied Medical Sciences, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, SINDHI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3420 Rebecca Street
Lakeshore Woods Medical Clinic
Unit 6 & 7
Dr. Pandhiani's Office
Oakville Ontario L6L 6W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 847-2525
Fax: 905-847-4447
Address: 3420 Rebecca Street
Lakeshore Woods Medical Clinic
UNIT 6 & 7
Oakville Ontario L6L 6W2
Phone: (905) 847-2525
Fax: 905-847-4447

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jan 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 11 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: PANDHIANI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Pandhiani (CPSO#: 151112 )
Business Address: 3420 Rebecca Street
Lakeshore Woods Medical Clinic
Unit 6 & 7
Dr. Pandhiani's Office
Oakville Ontario L6L 6W2
(905) 847-2525
Business Address: 9021 Derry Road
Unit 12
Milton Ontario L9T 7Y9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, SINDHI, URDU
Medical School: Isra University, Hyderabad Faculty of Medicine and Allied Medical Sciences, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3420 Rebecca Street
Lakeshore Woods Medical Clinic
Unit 6 & 7
Dr. Pandhiani's Office
Oakville Ontario L6L 6W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 847-2525
Fax: 905-847-4447
Address: 3420 Rebecca Street
Lakeshore Woods Medical Clinic
UNIT 6 & 7
Oakville Ontario L6L 6W2
Phone: (905) 847-2525
Fax: 905-847-4447

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jan 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 11 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: PANDHIANI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Pandhiani (CPSO#: 151112 )
Business Address: 3420 Rebecca Street
Lakeshore Woods Medical Clinic
Unit 6 & 7
Dr. Pandhiani's Office
Oakville Ontario L6L 6W2
(905) 847-2525
Business Address: 9021 Derry Road
Unit 12
Milton Ontario L9T 7Y9

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
15 Jan 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 15 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MOHAMMAD AWAIS PANDHIANI may practise medicine independently in family medicine
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MOHAMMAD AWAIS PANDHIANI may practise medicine independently in family medicine

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Isra University, Hyderabad Faculty of Medicine and Allied Medical Sciences, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2024