THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 04:53:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Islamic Azad University Tehran Faculty of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga Hospital
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101 Queensway W
Summerville Family Medicine Teaching Unit
Mississauga ON L5B 2P7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Islamic Azad University Tehran Faculty of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga Hospital
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101 Queensway W
Summerville Family Medicine Teaching Unit
Mississauga ON L5B 2P7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARJAN ENTEZAMI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ENTEZAMI is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. ENTEZAMI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ENTEZAMI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ENTEZAMI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ENTEZAMI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ENTEZAMI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 24 August, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARJAN ENTEZAMI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ENTEZAMI is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. ENTEZAMI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ENTEZAMI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ENTEZAMI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ENTEZAMI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ENTEZAMI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 24 August, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Islamic Azad University Tehran Faculty of Medicine, 2015
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2025 to 24 Aug 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
26 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 25 Aug 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
20 Nov 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PEAP - R - Family Medicine
28 Aug 2023 to 19 Nov 2023
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 24 Aug 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 26 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 25 Aug 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 20 Nov 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - Family Medicine
DATE: 28 Aug 2023 to 19 Nov 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 24 Aug 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 24 Aug 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2023