THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:22:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Rd
Department of Radiology
The Ottawa Hospital
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 00447818062594
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 04 Jul 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 04 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Rd
Department of Radiology
The Ottawa Hospital
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 00447818062594
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 04 Jul 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 04 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
05 Jul 2024
31 May 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 05 2024
EXPIRY DATE: May 31 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. RAMY MANSOUR may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Radiology, Radiation Oncology and Medical Physics, Division of Medical Imaging, at the University of Ottawa, in which Dr. MANSOUR holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. MANSOUR no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Note: This certificate is issued on 05 July, 2024, and expires on 31 May, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. MANSOUR's academic appointment at the University of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraph 2 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. RAMY MANSOUR may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Radiology, Radiation Oncology and Medical Physics, Division of Medical Imaging, at the University of Ottawa, in which Dr. MANSOUR holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. MANSOUR no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Note: This certificate is issued on 05 July, 2024, and expires on 31 May, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. MANSOUR's academic appointment at the University of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraph 2 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 31 May 2027