THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:15:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: Dawodu, Rashidat Anike (Used Until: 17 Jul 2023)
Medical School: Lagos State University College of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1916 Dundas Street East
Valley Medical centre
Unit 6
Whitby Ontario L1N 2L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054341662
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: RADAR MEDICAL PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Agoro (CPSO#: 152019 )
Business Address: 7 Waterfront Crescent
Whitby Ontario L1N

General Information

Former Name: Dawodu, Rashidat Anike (Used Until: 17 Jul 2023)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Lagos State University College of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1916 Dundas Street East
Valley Medical centre
Unit 6
Whitby Ontario L1N 2L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054341662
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: RADAR MEDICAL PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Agoro (CPSO#: 152019 )
Business Address: 7 Waterfront Crescent
Whitby Ontario L1N

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
09 Jan 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 09 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. RASHIDAT ANIKE AGORO may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. RASHIDAT ANIKE AGORO may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Lagos State University College of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 2024