THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:49:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidade Federal do Rio Grande (FURG) Faculdade de Medicina, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 5777 Stn B
London ON N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 01 Mar 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. CORONEL CAMACHO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Camacho (CPSO#: 152747 )
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universidade Federal do Rio Grande (FURG) Faculdade de Medicina, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 5777 Stn B
London ON N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 01 Mar 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. CORONEL CAMACHO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Camacho (CPSO#: 152747 )
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Mar 2024
30 Jun 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 01 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. ALEX DE OLIVEIRA CORONEL CAMACHO may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Ophthalmology, Western University, in which Dr. CAMACHO holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. CAMACHO no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. CAMACHO’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. CAMACHO’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 March, 2024, and expires on 30 June, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. CAMACHO's academic appointment at Western University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. ALEX DE OLIVEIRA CORONEL CAMACHO may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Ophthalmology, Western University, in which Dr. CAMACHO holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. CAMACHO no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. CAMACHO’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. CAMACHO’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 March, 2024, and expires on 30 June, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. CAMACHO's academic appointment at Western University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidade Federal do Rio Grande (FURG) Faculdade de Medicina, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026