THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:56:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Hopeton St
Cambridge ON N1R 3T3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 267-0500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2579 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8K 4B8
Phone: 2896673709
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. NOOR IBRAHEEM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ibraheem (CPSO#: 152810 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Hopeton St
Cambridge ON N1R 3T3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 267-0500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2579 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8K 4B8
Phone: 2896673709
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. NOOR IBRAHEEM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ibraheem (CPSO#: 152810 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
19 Dec 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 19 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. NOOR IBRAHEEM may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. NOOR IBRAHEEM may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2023
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2023