THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:43:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: Ayak, Joy Nenka (Used Until: 11 Sep 2023)
Medical School: University of Calabar College of Medical Sciences, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 537 Frederick Street
Magnolia Health Center
Kitchener Ontario N2B 2A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +1 519-804-4190
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Oct 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JOY CHIBUZO-OKOYE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chibuzo-Okoye (CPSO#: 153144 )
Business Address: 24 Dewberry Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2B 1R5
519-804-4190

General Information

Former Name: Ayak, Joy Nenka (Used Until: 11 Sep 2023)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calabar College of Medical Sciences, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 537 Frederick Street
Magnolia Health Center
Kitchener Ontario N2B 2A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +1 519-804-4190
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Oct 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JOY CHIBUZO-OKOYE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chibuzo-Okoye (CPSO#: 153144 )
Business Address: 24 Dewberry Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2B 1R5
519-804-4190

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOY NENKA CHIBUZO-OKOYE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIBUZO-OKOYE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOY NENKA CHIBUZO-OKOYE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIBUZO-OKOYE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calabar College of Medical Sciences, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2023
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Oct 2023