THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 06:13:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 The East Mall
Toronto Ontario M9B 4B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166396810
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Mar 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. HAMZA MIR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Mir (CPSO#: 153250 )
Business Address: 600 The East Mall
Toronto Ontario M9B 4B1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 The East Mall
Toronto Ontario M9B 4B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166396810
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Mar 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. HAMZA MIR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Mir (CPSO#: 153250 )
Business Address: 600 The East Mall
Toronto Ontario M9B 4B1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAMZA MIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAMZA MIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Apr 2024