THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 03:34:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Oman Medical College, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lyndon
Lyndon Primary Health Centre
Lower Lyndon
West Bromwich West Midlands B71 4HJ
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +44 121 612 3575
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Dec 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 13 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alwash Medical Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Alwash (CPSO#: 153267 )
Business Address: 9058053848

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Oman Medical College, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lyndon
Lyndon Primary Health Centre
Lower Lyndon
West Bromwich West Midlands B71 4HJ
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +44 121 612 3575
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Dec 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 13 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alwash Medical Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Alwash (CPSO#: 153267 )
Business Address: 9058053848

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
15 Dec 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 15 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MOSTAFA AKRAM KADHUM ALWASH may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MOSTAFA AKRAM KADHUM ALWASH may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Oman Medical College, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2023
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2023