THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:34:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: J.J.M. Medical College, Davangere, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, KANNADA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 301-565 College St
Manning Health Choice Centre
Toronto ON M6G 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-532-2722
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Dec 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 13 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: VIVEK PATIL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Patil (CPSO#: 153277 )
Business Address: 301-567 College Street
Manning Health Choice Centre
Toronto Ontario M6G 1B2
4165322722

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, KANNADA
Medical School: J.J.M. Medical College, Davangere, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 301-565 College St
Manning Health Choice Centre
Toronto ON M6G 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-532-2722
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Dec 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 13 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: VIVEK PATIL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Patil (CPSO#: 153277 )
Business Address: 301-567 College Street
Manning Health Choice Centre
Toronto Ontario M6G 1B2
4165322722

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
19 Dec 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 19 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. VIVEK PATIL may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. VIVEK PATIL may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: J.J.M. Medical College, Davangere, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2023
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2023