THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:34:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2157 Royal Windsor Dr
Royal Windsor Medical Clinic
Mississauga ON L5J 1K5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 373-1089
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MAYSAM AWADH FADHIL AL-DULAIMI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Al-Dulaimi (CPSO#: 153328 )
Business Address: 2157 Royal Windsor Drive
Royal Windsor Medical Clinic
Mississauga Ontario L5J 1K5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2157 Royal Windsor Dr
Royal Windsor Medical Clinic
Mississauga ON L5J 1K5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 373-1089
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MAYSAM AWADH FADHIL AL-DULAIMI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Al-Dulaimi (CPSO#: 153328 )
Business Address: 2157 Royal Windsor Drive
Royal Windsor Medical Clinic
Mississauga Ontario L5J 1K5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAYSAM AWADH FADHIL AL-DULAIMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-DULAIMI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAYSAM AWADH FADHIL AL-DULAIMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-DULAIMI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2023
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 16 Nov 2026