THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:56:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1040 Oliver Road
1040 Oliver Road
Gastroenterology
Suite 103
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7A5
Phone: (807) 767-7211
Fax: (807) 696-0168

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Gastroenterology
Effective: 11 Dec 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Polewiczowska-Nowak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Polewiczowska-Nowak (CPSO#: 153418 )
Business Address: 1040 Oliver Road
Unit 103
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7A5
Business Address:

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1040 Oliver Road
1040 Oliver Road
Gastroenterology
Suite 103
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7A5
Phone: (807) 767-7211
Fax: (807) 696-0168

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Gastroenterology
Effective: 11 Dec 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Polewiczowska-Nowak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Polewiczowska-Nowak (CPSO#: 153418 )
Business Address: 1040 Oliver Road
Unit 103
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7A5
Business Address:

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
11 Dec 2023
30 Jun 2030
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 11 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2030
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. BEATA EWELINA POLEWICZOWSKA-NOWAK may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Internal Medicine, Division of Clinical Sciences, Northern Ontario School of Medicine, in which Dr. POLEWICZOWSKA-NOWAK holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. POLEWICZOWSKA-NOWAK no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. POLEWICZOWSKA-NOWAK’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. POLEWICZOWSKA-NOWAK’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 11 December, 2023, and expires on 30 June, 2030. Upon renewal of Dr. POLEWICZOWSKA-NOWAK's academic appointment at the Northern Ontario School of Medicine, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. BEATA EWELINA POLEWICZOWSKA-NOWAK may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Internal Medicine, Division of Clinical Sciences, Northern Ontario School of Medicine, in which Dr. POLEWICZOWSKA-NOWAK holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. POLEWICZOWSKA-NOWAK no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. POLEWICZOWSKA-NOWAK’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. POLEWICZOWSKA-NOWAK’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 11 December, 2023, and expires on 30 June, 2030. Upon renewal of Dr. POLEWICZOWSKA-NOWAK's academic appointment at the Northern Ontario School of Medicine, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2023
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2030