THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:24:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Hematology and Oncology
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7809836494
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: 7809836494
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 03 Nov 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Ganta Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ganta (CPSO#: 153432 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
7809836494

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Hematology and Oncology
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7809836494
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: 7809836494
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 03 Nov 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Ganta Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ganta (CPSO#: 153432 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
7809836494

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NINADA GANTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NINADA GANTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2023
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2023