THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:27:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sumy State University Medical Institute, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 613 Longfields Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2J 6B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +16134407762
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Dec 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 13 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: TonyCheta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. TonyCheta (CPSO#: 153671 )
Business Address: 4-1 Tartan Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2J 2W7
Business Address: 613 Longfields Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2J 6B7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Sumy State University Medical Institute, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 613 Longfields Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2J 6B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +16134407762
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Dec 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 13 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: TonyCheta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. TonyCheta (CPSO#: 153671 )
Business Address: 4-1 Tartan Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2J 2W7
Business Address: 613 Longfields Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2J 6B7

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
15 Dec 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 15 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ADAEZE TONYCHETA may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ADAEZE TONYCHETA may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sumy State University Medical Institute, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2023
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2023