THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:53:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Lagos State University College of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2291 Danforth Avenue
Danforth main pharmacy and medical clinic
Toronto Ontario M4C 1K5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166913356
Fax: 4166980029
Address: 2291 Danforth Avenue
Danforth main pharmacy and medical clinic
Toronto Ontario M4C 1K5
Phone: 4166915550
Fax: 4166980029
Address: 280-2213 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6S 1N5
Phone: 416-800-9697
Fax: 416 695 2622
Address: 400 Adelaide Street East
The S&Y Clinic St Lawrence
Unit Number 105
Unit Number 105
Toronto Ontario M5A 4S3
Phone: 647-509-8792
Fax: 855-953-3580

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Apr 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 23 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: AKINJOBI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Akinjobi (CPSO#: 153707 )
Business Address: 2213 Bloor Street West
Runnymede walk-in medical clinic
suite 280
Toronto Ontario M6S 1N5
4374310721

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Lagos State University College of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2291 Danforth Avenue
Danforth main pharmacy and medical clinic
Toronto Ontario M4C 1K5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166913356
Fax: 4166980029
Address: 2291 Danforth Avenue
Danforth main pharmacy and medical clinic
Toronto Ontario M4C 1K5
Phone: 4166915550
Fax: 4166980029
Address: 280-2213 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6S 1N5
Phone: 416-800-9697
Fax: 416 695 2622
Address: 400 Adelaide Street East
The S&Y Clinic St Lawrence
Unit Number 105
Unit Number 105
Toronto Ontario M5A 4S3
Phone: 647-509-8792
Fax: 855-953-3580

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Apr 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 23 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: AKINJOBI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Akinjobi (CPSO#: 153707 )
Business Address: 2213 Bloor Street West
Runnymede walk-in medical clinic
suite 280
Toronto Ontario M6S 1N5
4374310721

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
24 Apr 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 24 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. OBAFEMI ALFRED AKINJOBI may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. OBAFEMI ALFRED AKINJOBI may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Lagos State University College of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Apr 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Apr 2024