THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:38:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: George Washington University School of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166032581
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 16 Jan 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Pain Medicine
Effective: 16 Jan 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 16 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Pain Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 16 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
USA - Texas
USA - West Virginia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. P. SAYAL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sayal (CPSO#: 153962 )
Business Address: 103 Botfield Avenue
Toronto Ontario M9B 4E5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: George Washington University School of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166032581
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 16 Jan 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Pain Medicine
Effective: 16 Jan 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 16 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Pain Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 16 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
USA - Texas
USA - West Virginia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. P. SAYAL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sayal (CPSO#: 153962 )
Business Address: 103 Botfield Avenue
Toronto Ontario M9B 4E5

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
17 Jan 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 17 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. PUNEET KUMAR SAYAL may practise medicine independently in anesthesiology and pain medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. PUNEET KUMAR SAYAL may practise medicine independently in anesthesiology and pain medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: George Washington University School of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2024