THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:12:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. Matthew's University School of Medicine (Grand Cayman), 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11400 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor Ontario N8N 1L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197352558
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 11400 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor Ontario N8N 1L7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Aug 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 16 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 13 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ALEXANDRA SPIROU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Spirou (CPSO#: 154032 )
Business Address: 11400 Tecumseh Road East
Unit 1
Windsor Ontario N8N 1L7
519-735-2558

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. Matthew's University School of Medicine (Grand Cayman), 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11400 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor Ontario N8N 1L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197352558
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 11400 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor Ontario N8N 1L7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Aug 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 16 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 13 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ALEXANDRA SPIROU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Spirou (CPSO#: 154032 )
Business Address: 11400 Tecumseh Road East
Unit 1
Windsor Ontario N8N 1L7
519-735-2558

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA ELIZABETH SPIROU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPIROU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA ELIZABETH SPIROU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPIROU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. Matthew's University School of Medicine (Grand Cayman), 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2024
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Nov 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2024