THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:48:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Islamic Azad University Tehran Faculty of Medicine, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2389 Major Mackenzie Drive West
BioHealth Centre
Vaughan Ontario L6A 3Z2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 303-7217
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Unit 127-7163 Yonge Street
Thornhill Ontario L3T 0C6
Phone: (905) 597-7275
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 May 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 22 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MOIN SADAT MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Moin Sadat (CPSO#: 154141 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Islamic Azad University Tehran Faculty of Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2389 Major Mackenzie Drive West
BioHealth Centre
Vaughan Ontario L6A 3Z2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 303-7217
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Unit 127-7163 Yonge Street
Thornhill Ontario L3T 0C6
Phone: (905) 597-7275
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 May 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 22 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MOIN SADAT MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Moin Sadat (CPSO#: 154141 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HODA MOIN SADAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOIN SADAT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HODA MOIN SADAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOIN SADAT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Islamic Azad University Tehran Faculty of Medicine, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 May 2024
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 May 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 May 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 21 May 2027