THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:25:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Services Institute of Medical Sciences, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 Dundas Street East
Dundas Medicare Medical Clinic
Mississauga Ontario L5A 1W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 365-722-0620
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 258 Queen Street South
Queen Thomas Urgent Care Centre
Mississauga Ontario L5M 1L8
Phone: (905) 997-2424
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Feb 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 08 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR F B NAEEM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Naeem (CPSO#: 154224 )
Business Address: 258 Queen Street South
Mississauga Ontario L5M 1L8
(905) 997-2424

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Services Institute of Medical Sciences, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 Dundas Street East
Dundas Medicare Medical Clinic
Mississauga Ontario L5A 1W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 365-722-0620
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 258 Queen Street South
Queen Thomas Urgent Care Centre
Mississauga Ontario L5M 1L8
Phone: (905) 997-2424
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Feb 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 08 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR F B NAEEM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Naeem (CPSO#: 154224 )
Business Address: 258 Queen Street South
Mississauga Ontario L5M 1L8
(905) 997-2424

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
11 Feb 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 11 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. FAHEEM BIN NAEEM may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. FAHEEM BIN NAEEM may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Services Institute of Medical Sciences, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2024