THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 06:04:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Lagos College of Medicine, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 39 Queen St
Phoenix Medical Clinic
St. Catharines ON L2R 5G6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 378-6040
Fax: (855) 422-0369

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Feb 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 26 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N OLUDE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Olude (CPSO#: 154386 )
Business Address: 39 Queen Street
St. Catharines Ontario L2R 5G6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Lagos College of Medicine, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 39 Queen St
Phoenix Medical Clinic
St. Catharines ON L2R 5G6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 378-6040
Fax: (855) 422-0369

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Feb 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 26 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N OLUDE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Olude (CPSO#: 154386 )
Business Address: 39 Queen Street
St. Catharines Ontario L2R 5G6

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
06 Mar 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 06 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. NATHANIEL OLAKUNLE OLUDE may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. NATHANIEL OLAKUNLE OLUDE may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Lagos College of Medicine, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Mar 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Mar 2024