THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 03:48:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Islamic Azad University Tehran Faculty of Medicine, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 315 Pembroke Street East
Pembroke BAHX FHO
Pembroke Ontario K8A 3K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-735-1089
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 MacKay St
Pembroke Ontario K8A 0C6
Phone: (613) 732-2811
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Ali Ziaee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ziaee (CPSO#: 154532 )
Business Address: 315 Pembroke Street East
Pembroke Ontario K8A 3K2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Islamic Azad University Tehran Faculty of Medicine, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 315 Pembroke Street East
Pembroke BAHX FHO
Pembroke Ontario K8A 3K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-735-1089
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 MacKay St
Pembroke Ontario K8A 0C6
Phone: (613) 732-2811
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Ali Ziaee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ziaee (CPSO#: 154532 )
Business Address: 315 Pembroke Street East
Pembroke Ontario K8A 3K2

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
21 Nov 2024
20 Sep 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 21 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Sep 20 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. SEYED ALI ZIAEE may practise family medicine with the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) Pembroke BAHX FHO in Pembroke, Ontario;

(ii) Pembroke Regional Hospital in Pembroke, Ontario; and

(iii) in accordance with Dr. ZIAEE’s Return of Service Agreement with the Crown in Right of the Province of Ontario and the Addendum to the Return of Service Agreement that Dr. Ziaee signed on December 23, 2023.

2. The certificate of registration will automatically expire on September 20, 2027, or when Dr. Ziaee’s eligibility to take the College of Family Physicians of Canada expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. ZIAEE’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. ZIAEE’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 21 September, 2024, and will expire on or before 20 September, 2027, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. SEYED ALI ZIAEE may practise family medicine with the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) Pembroke BAHX FHO in Pembroke, Ontario;

(ii) Pembroke Regional Hospital in Pembroke, Ontario; and

(iii) in accordance with Dr. ZIAEE’s Return of Service Agreement with the Crown in Right of the Province of Ontario and the Addendum to the Return of Service Agreement that Dr. Ziaee signed on December 23, 2023.

2. The certificate of registration will automatically expire on September 20, 2027, or when Dr. Ziaee’s eligibility to take the College of Family Physicians of Canada expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. ZIAEE’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. ZIAEE’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 21 September, 2024, and will expire on or before 20 September, 2027, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Islamic Azad University Tehran Faculty of Medicine, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 21 Nov 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Sep 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 20 Sep 2027

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2024