THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:30:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Rawalpindi Medical University, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6750 Winston Churchill Boulevard
Mississauga Ontario L5N 4C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-997-3080
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Feb 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M HAMID MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hamid (CPSO#: 154811 )
Business Address: 910 Chambers Place
Milton Ontario L9T 6A5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Rawalpindi Medical University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6750 Winston Churchill Boulevard
Mississauga Ontario L5N 4C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-997-3080
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Feb 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M HAMID MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hamid (CPSO#: 154811 )
Business Address: 910 Chambers Place
Milton Ontario L9T 6A5

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
29 Feb 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 29 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MISBAH HAMID may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MISBAH HAMID may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Rawalpindi Medical University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Feb 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Feb 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Feb 2024