THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:42:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: Badmus, Adenike Khadijat (Used Until: 04 Feb 2024)
Medical School: Obafemi Awolowo College of Health Sciences, Olabisi Onabanjo University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7-3500 Brock Street North
Eclat Medical Centre- Family Practice and Walk-in Clinic
Whitby Ontario L1R 3J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054307774
Fax: 9054307767

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Apr 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 26 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR ADENIKE BAKARE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bakare (CPSO#: 154818 )
Business Address: Unit 7-3500 Brock Street North
Eclat Medical Centre- Family Practice and Walk-in Clinic
Whitby Ontario L1R 3J4
905 430 7774

General Information

Former Name: Badmus, Adenike Khadijat (Used Until: 04 Feb 2024)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Obafemi Awolowo College of Health Sciences, Olabisi Onabanjo University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7-3500 Brock Street North
Eclat Medical Centre- Family Practice and Walk-in Clinic
Whitby Ontario L1R 3J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054307774
Fax: 9054307767

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Apr 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 26 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR ADENIKE BAKARE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bakare (CPSO#: 154818 )
Business Address: Unit 7-3500 Brock Street North
Eclat Medical Centre- Family Practice and Walk-in Clinic
Whitby Ontario L1R 3J4
905 430 7774

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADENIKE KHADIJAT BAKARE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKARE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADENIKE KHADIJAT BAKARE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKARE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Obafemi Awolowo College of Health Sciences, Olabisi Onabanjo University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2024