THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:20:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Birmingham College of Medical and Dental Sciences, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Ontario L1P 0P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 721 6160
Fax: 905 721 7040

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mudondo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mudondo (CPSO#: 154840 )
Business Address: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Ontario L1P 0P9
905 721 6160
Business Address: 1645 Dundas Street East
Whitby Ontario L1N 2K9
9055795553

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Birmingham College of Medical and Dental Sciences, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Ontario L1P 0P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 721 6160
Fax: 905 721 7040

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mudondo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mudondo (CPSO#: 154840 )
Business Address: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Ontario L1P 0P9
905 721 6160
Business Address: 1645 Dundas Street East
Whitby Ontario L1N 2K9
9055795553

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
29 Jun 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 29 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. NYASHA PRIMROSE MUDONDO may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. NYASHA PRIMROSE MUDONDO may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Birmingham College of Medical and Dental Sciences, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2024