THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:36:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: Dawes, Hermoine Angelique (Used Until: 05 Dec 2023)
Medical School: Facultad de Ciencias Médicas de Granma 'Celia Sanchez Manduley', 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Montefiore Medical Centre
Dumpton Park Drive
Ramsgate Kent CT11 8AD
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +441843855800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Feb 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 08 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: HERMOINE DAWES-SIMPSON MEDICAL PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Dawes-Simpson (CPSO#: 154883 )
Business Address: 2620 Simcoe Street North
UNIT 1
Oshawa Ontario L1H 7K4
9054329463 Extn: 2

General Information

Former Name: Dawes, Hermoine Angelique (Used Until: 05 Dec 2023)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Facultad de Ciencias Médicas de Granma 'Celia Sanchez Manduley', 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Montefiore Medical Centre
Dumpton Park Drive
Ramsgate Kent CT11 8AD
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +441843855800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Feb 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 08 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: HERMOINE DAWES-SIMPSON MEDICAL PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Dawes-Simpson (CPSO#: 154883 )
Business Address: 2620 Simcoe Street North
UNIT 1
Oshawa Ontario L1H 7K4
9054329463 Extn: 2

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
09 Feb 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 09 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. HERMOINE ANGEĹIQUE DAWES-SIMPSON may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. HERMOINE ANGEĹIQUE DAWES-SIMPSON may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Facultad de Ciencias Médicas de Granma 'Celia Sanchez Manduley', 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 2024