THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 02:57:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Jacobs School of Medicine and Biomedical Sciences, University at Buffalo, 2021
Gender: Non-Binary
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 835 King Street West
Grand River Hospital
Kitchener Ontario N2G 4K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 911 Queen's Boulevard
St. Mary’s General Hospital
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: 519-744-3311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 29 Oct 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 29 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Waterloo Regional Health Network Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Waterloo Regional Health Network
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JENNIFER WANG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wang (CPSO#: 154894 )
Business Address: 835 King Street West
Grand River Hospital
KW Campus
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Address: 911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Non-Binary
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Jacobs School of Medicine and Biomedical Sciences, University at Buffalo, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 835 King Street West
Grand River Hospital
Kitchener Ontario N2G 4K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 911 Queen's Boulevard
St. Mary’s General Hospital
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: 519-744-3311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 29 Oct 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 29 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Waterloo Regional Health Network Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Waterloo Regional Health Network
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JENNIFER WANG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wang (CPSO#: 154894 )
Business Address: 835 King Street West
Grand River Hospital
KW Campus
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Address: 911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
29 Oct 2024
28 Oct 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 29 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Oct 28 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. JENNIFER WANG may practise emergency medicine at the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) Grand River Hospital, in Kitchener,, Ontario; and

(ii) St Mary's Hospital in Kitchener,, Ontario.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. WANG’s eligibility to take the American Board of Emergency Medicine examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. WANG’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. WANG’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 29 October, 2024, and will expire on or before 28 October, 2027, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. JENNIFER WANG may practise emergency medicine at the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) Grand River Hospital, in Kitchener,, Ontario; and

(ii) St Mary's Hospital in Kitchener,, Ontario.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. WANG’s eligibility to take the American Board of Emergency Medicine examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. WANG’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. WANG’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 29 October, 2024, and will expire on or before 28 October, 2027, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Jacobs School of Medicine and Biomedical Sciences, University at Buffalo, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 28 Oct 2027