THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:52:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bristol Circle
100
Prism Eye Institute
Oakville Ontario L6H
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054563937
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Prism Eye Institute
2201 Bristol Cir
Oakville ON L6H 0J8
Phone: 9054563937
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2201 Bristol Circle
Suite 200
Oakville Ontario L6H 0J8
Phone: 8557562020
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2 Champagne Drive
Toronto Ontario M3J 0K2
Phone: 4167482020
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 25 Mar 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 25 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F.R. MOTI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Moti (CPSO#: 155016 )
Business Address: Bristol Circle
100
Prism Eye Institute
Oakville Ontario L6H
9054563937

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bristol Circle
100
Prism Eye Institute
Oakville Ontario L6H
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054563937
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Prism Eye Institute
2201 Bristol Cir
Oakville ON L6H 0J8
Phone: 9054563937
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2201 Bristol Circle
Suite 200
Oakville Ontario L6H 0J8
Phone: 8557562020
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2 Champagne Drive
Toronto Ontario M3J 0K2
Phone: 4167482020
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 25 Mar 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 25 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F.R. MOTI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Moti (CPSO#: 155016 )
Business Address: Bristol Circle
100
Prism Eye Institute
Oakville Ontario L6H
9054563937

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
06 May 2025
24 Mar 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 06 2025
EXPIRY DATE: Mar 24 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. FARAH RAZACK MOTI may practise ophthalmology at the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) Prism Eye Institute - Oakville in Oakville, Ontario;

(ii) North Toronto Eye Care at 2065 Finch Avenue in Toronto, Ontario;

(iii) North Toronto Eye Care at 2 Champagne Drive in Toronto, Ontario; and

(iv) TLC Laser Eye Institute in Oakville, Ontario.

2. The certificate of registration will automatically expire on March 24, 2027, or when Dr. MOTI’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. MOTI’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. MOTI’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 25 March, 2024, and will expire on or before 24 March, 2027, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. FARAH RAZACK MOTI may practise ophthalmology at the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) Prism Eye Institute - Oakville in Oakville, Ontario;

(ii) North Toronto Eye Care at 2065 Finch Avenue in Toronto, Ontario;

(iii) North Toronto Eye Care at 2 Champagne Drive in Toronto, Ontario; and

(iv) TLC Laser Eye Institute in Oakville, Ontario.

2. The certificate of registration will automatically expire on March 24, 2027, or when Dr. MOTI’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. MOTI’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. MOTI’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 25 March, 2024, and will expire on or before 24 March, 2027, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 06 May 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 May 2025
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 24 Mar 2027

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Mar 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Mar 2024