THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 04:50:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. Matthew's University School of Medicine (Grand Cayman), 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 220 Wexford Road
Brampton Ontario L6Z 4N7
Phone: 90549491111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Aug 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 15 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ANIQ HAKIM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hakim (CPSO#: 155048 )
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. Matthew's University School of Medicine (Grand Cayman), 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 220 Wexford Road
Brampton Ontario L6Z 4N7
Phone: 90549491111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Aug 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 15 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ANIQ HAKIM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hakim (CPSO#: 155048 )
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANIQ RAHIBUL HAKIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAKIM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANIQ RAHIBUL HAKIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAKIM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. Matthew's University School of Medicine (Grand Cayman), 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2024