THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:55:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Nnamdi Azikiwe University College of Health Sciences, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 39 Queen Street
St. Catharines Ontario L2R 5G6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053786040
Fax: 8554220369

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Mar 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 11 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: g.ugamah medicine professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Ugamah (CPSO#: 155135 )
Business Address: 39 Queen Street
St. Catharines Ontario L2R 5G6
9053786040

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Nnamdi Azikiwe University College of Health Sciences, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 39 Queen Street
St. Catharines Ontario L2R 5G6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053786040
Fax: 8554220369

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Mar 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 11 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: g.ugamah medicine professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Ugamah (CPSO#: 155135 )
Business Address: 39 Queen Street
St. Catharines Ontario L2R 5G6
9053786040

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
14 Mar 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 14 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. GABRIEL OBINNA UGAMAH may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. GABRIEL OBINNA UGAMAH may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Nnamdi Azikiwe University College of Health Sciences, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2024